The Friends of Little Melton Church Trust

Charity number: 1078896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.68k £2.99k £3.14k £3.92k £1.78k
Total expenditure £901 £763 £1.05k £630 £554
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A