Financial history MISS EVELYN DAPHNE HARGREAVES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1078662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/11/2016 10/11/2017 10/11/2018 10/11/2019 10/11/2020
Total gross income £9.90k £10.27k £10.75k £9.44k £4.20k
Total expenditure £10.41k £9.46k £11.03k £10.72k £9.65k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A