N.F.F.O TRAINING TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1080995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust was set up to promote and provide vocational training and to advance the education of the public in all matters related to the Fishing Industry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,573
Total expenditure: £48,298

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT MARSH CASSON Trustee
None on record
GARY HODGSON Trustee
None on record
BARRIE DEAS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £100.03k £100.12k £100.02k £100.30k £2.57k
Total expenditure £3.48k £5.48k £98.62k £110.90k £48.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 November 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 March 2024 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 March 2024 146 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 GEORGE STREET
YORK
YO1 9QA
Phone:
01904635430
Website:

No information available