Accounts and annual returns SMART WORKS CHARITY

Charity number: 1080609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window