UK SYSTEMS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1078782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.34k £3.19k £3.58k £4.04k £1.76k
Total expenditure £3.13k £2.53k £1.58k £1.46k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A