THE BRENDISH FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting various charities and charitable projects (although not usually from unsolicited applications).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDERICK WILLIAM PRITCHARD-SMITH | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Brendish | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAYTON MARK BRENDISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NATHAN JAMES BRENDISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATALIE LAUREN PRITCHARD-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM LEONARD CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN ANN FENTON BRENDISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.54k | £43.30k | £43.47k | £682.36k | £76.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.01k | £12.80k | £37.11k | £169.42k | £87.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £625.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £169.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £159.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
ALL SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kimbridge Estate Office
Kimbridge Lane
Romsey
Hampshire
SO51 0LE
- Phone:
- 01794 340170
- Email:
- jessica@pendennis.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window