Woodcroft Academy Leek PTFA

Charity number: 1078839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 October 2020 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 November 2020 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required