C2K

Charity number: 1080645
Charity reporting is overdue by 1450 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 354 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 354 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 720 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1085 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1085 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1450 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1450 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required