C2K

Charity number: 1080645
Charity reporting is overdue by 1450 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £40.47k £59.61k £71.39k £48.40k £20.51k
Total expenditure £40.09k £51.18k £72.82k £66.90k £37.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0