Accounts and annual returns OASIS CITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1080646
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 April 2023 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 April 2023 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 September 2022 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 September 2022 209 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 September 2022 574 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 September 2022 574 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 September 2022 940 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 September 2022 940 days late Download Open in new window