MULTI CULTURAL INTEGRATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1098620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 January 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 November 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 December 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 09 November 2016 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required