Financial history THURROCK COMMUNITY LEISURE LIMITED

Charity number: 1080186
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.67m £5.98m £6.00m £2.72m £4.50m
Total expenditure £5.81m £5.92m £6.29m £3.99m £4.59m
Income from government contracts £91.62k £154.24k £73.06k £20.63k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.52m £206.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.02m £51.43k
Income - Other trading activities £221.80k £194.49k £160.97k £48.42k £131.78k
Income - Charitable activities £5.38m £5.74m £5.80m £1.64m £4.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £46.94k £42.93k £37.72k £12.41k £302
Income - Other £15.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.13m £5.27m £5.72m £3.70m £4.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £137.71k £148.82k £144.08k £56.42k £80.46k
Expenditure - Governance £8.24k £7.44k £9.14k £11.45k £8.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £541.13k £495.49k £421.55k £233.84k £296.94k