Trustees THURROCK COMMUNITY LEISURE LIMITED
Charity number: 1080186

Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Ian James Couldridge | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Zameziza Longe | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Joy Redsell | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr James Thandi | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Cole | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wintour | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jatinder Singh Nahal | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kameel Zaid Mohammed | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Matthew Watson | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY KENT NORRINGTON | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
TUNDE OJETOLA | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.