SILVERDALE ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 April 2021 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 October 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required