SILVERDALE ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Margaret Walsh Trustee 10 May 2017 None on record
Kathryn Knox Trustee 23 May 2016 None on record
Julia Hague Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
Shelley Hackett Trustee 01 March 2017
MILNTHORPE STEEL BAND Received: On time
LOUISE DAW Trustee 05 November 2012 None on record
Lucy Lethbridge Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
CHANTEL GREENALL Trustee 01 March 2013 None on record