BEDS & HERTS HEDGEHOG RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 September 2000: Standard registration
- 19 April 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BEDS & HERTS HEDGEHOG HELPLINE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 04 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 04 April 2007 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 17TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE (1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF HEDGEHOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING A RESCUE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR ORPHANED, INJURED AND SICK HEDGEHOGS. (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE, TREATMENT AND NURSING OF SICK HEDGEHOGS AND THE CONSERVATION OF THE HABITAT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window