THE VEGAN-ORGANIC NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worldwide education about vegan - organic (stock free organic) growing for home and farm for the benefit of people, animals, and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Manchester City
Governance
- 23 May 2000: Standard registration
- VEGAN-ORGANIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliette Madden Bryant | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Taubman | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAN GRAHAM | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY CHUNG | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.64k | £22.28k | £31.90k | £22.09k | £22.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.47k | £41.47k | £43.34k | £38.60k | £38.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF VEGAN-ORGANIC HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO SUCH HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 HIGH LANE
MANCHESTER
M21 9DZ
- Phone:
- 01618604869
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window