Accounts and annual returns SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1079550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required