Trustees SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity number: 1079550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MICHAEL BARRETT OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pamela Kermode | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Susan Meade | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Howson | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Magaret Morton | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Anne Drage | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Anne Halpern | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Antoinette Byrne | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Julie Rendell-Dunn | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Ruth Meachin | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Strathearn Court | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN EDWARD CONNOLLY FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA MAUREEN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.