Trustees ABERDEEN PARK NURSERY
Charity number: 1116160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maximillian Seldon Whiteford | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie de Clermont | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicente Mira Gumucio | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Baddeley | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marivi Garcia Manzano | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
shanaz Begum | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Houghton | Trustee | 22 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.