Financial history WWF - UK

Charity number: 1081247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £67.63m £66.26m £80.84m £84.36m £91.04m
Total expenditure £62.37m £69.59m £78.28m £82.61m £92.14m
Income from government contracts N/A £10.00k £11.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £594.00k £769.00k £710.00k £1.80m
Income - Donations and legacies £58.81m £59.67m £69.05m £73.86m £79.15m
Income - Other trading activities £6.21m £2.92m £7.16m £6.94m £6.76m
Income - Charitable activities £1.90m £2.80m £3.80m £2.96m £4.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £711.00k £874.00k £841.00k £600.00k £669.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £15.46m £14.76m £16.96m £15.42m £15.35m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £48.81m £54.56m £59.84m £61.94m £69.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.00m £14.84m £18.44m £20.68m £22.84m
Expenditure - Governance £737.00k £742.00k £586.00k £841.00k £1.11m
Expenditure - Grants institution £24.68m £26.98m £31.01m £26.41m £33.19m
Expenditure - Investment management £176.00k £176.00k £190.00k £209.00k £222.00k
Expenditure - Other £555.00k £182.00k £0 £0 £157.00k