ARTS EXPRESS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts Express runs visual art workshops and projects in the community. Using drawing, printing, printing, monoprint, painting, 3D work , mosaics, stone carving , woodcarving and ceramics we work with individuals and communities to provide education, improvements in urban environments and social cohesion with an emphasis on inclusivity for people with disablities of all kinds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 June 2000: Standard registration
- 25 February 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 February 2020: Funds transferred to 1175722 BOLD EVERYWHERE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79k | £265 | £30 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59k | £2.24k | £44 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 September 2019 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 May 2018 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3RD APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, AND OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK PARTICULARLY, IN ALL BRANCHES OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF CARVING AND SCULPTURE
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window