FARNHAM CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1079778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.47k £60.89k £95.80k £111.69k £216.75k
Total expenditure £87.89k £83.95k £88.89k £99.80k £100.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A