EAST ANGLIAN ACADEMY OF EARLY MUSIC

Charity number: 1080668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.91k £7.95k £11.30k £10.31k £756
Total expenditure £4.23k £8.05k £10.35k £12.46k £135
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A