Governing document Friends of West Leigh Schools
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2016 as amended on 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RAISE FUNDS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING WEST LEIGH INFANT SCHOOL AND WEST LEIGH JUNIOR SCHOOLS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE SCHOOLS"). WEST LEIGH JUNIOR SCHOOL CONVERTED TO ACADEMY STATUS HEADED BY THE PORTICO ACADEMY TRUST IN 2016.
Area of benefit
WEST LEIGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.