LAW CENTRES FEDERATION

Charity number: 1088588
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claudia Estephane Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Pamela Monica Robotham Trustee 10 November 2017 None on record
Ngaryan Higham Trustee 06 November 2020 None on record
ELAYNE HILL Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record
Professor Sara Jean Mary Chandler Trustee 08 July 2019 None on record
Peter David Kandler Trustee 09 December 2019
NORTH KENSINGTON LAW CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
Susan Lynne James Trustee 10 November 2017 None on record
Roger Leslie Berry Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
SHARON CHALLANDS Trustee 10 November 2017 None on record
Patrick Michael Sebastian Marples Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Victoria Fewkes Trustee 08 November 2019
SOUTHWARK LAW CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
Manuela Berthe Grayson Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
DAVID CHARLES SLATER Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
HELEN CLARE DARBY ROGERS Chair 18 April 2012 None on record
Sean Canning Trustee 10 November 2017
BRENT COMMUNITY LAW CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
Ursula Anne O'Hare Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Linda Elizabeth Summers Trustee 08 November 2019
KIRKLEES CITIZENS ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE