AVENQUEST COMMUNITY REGENERATION TRUST LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The objectives of the charity are the promotion for the public of the benefits of urban and rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation and in particular in the central part of Preston known as the Avenham Ward. It achieved its objectives through participation in a number of community projects.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2006
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Swydd Gaerhirfryn
Llywodraethu
- 17 Rhagfyr 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Ebrill 2011: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- AQCRT (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £11.31k | £9.16k | £13.15k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £22.62k | £14.84k | £12.30k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2007 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2007 | 04 Mai 2009 | 278 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 MAY 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE CENTRAL PART OF PRESTON KNOWN AS THE AVENHAM WARD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS; A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MIGHT BE THOUGHT FIT B)THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR THE PROVISION OF CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP; (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING OR EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE I) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY, OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME
Maes buddion
THE CENTRAL PART OF PRESTON (LANCASHIRE) KNOWN AS THE AVENHAM WARD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window