Accounts and annual returns 44TH COVENTRY (1ST BRINKLOW) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1079329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required