Financial history 44TH COVENTRY (1ST BRINKLOW) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1079329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.60k £15.27k £23.09k £23.78k £20.80k
Total expenditure £11.07k £12.02k £20.90k £5.42k £10.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £535 N/A £21.05k £10.67k