Financial history KABBALAH CENTRE

Charity number: 1079796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.39m £3.51m £7.64m £2.92m £5.42m
Total expenditure £5.56m £5.65m £6.14m £4.22m £3.75m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.36m £1.62m £6.17m £1.35m £4.28m
Income - Other trading activities £528.43k £287.72k £120.51k £57.07k £78.68k
Income - Charitable activities £749.93k £839.38k £792.94k £456.77k £582.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £624.85k £641.34k £390.25k £369.95k £308.02k
Income - Other £124.80k £124.80k £173.11k £684.31k £172.44k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.67m £4.53m £5.16m £3.98m £3.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £894.08k £1.11m £980.77k £239.40k £127.77k
Expenditure - Governance £167.66k £191.98k £263.57k £57.36k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £239.87k £0 £200.01k £173.68k £127.17k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0