Governing document KABBALAH CENTRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2013 as amended on 01 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF KABBALAH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.