Financial history NORTHERN PASTURES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1079271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £41.50k £71.80k £77.59k £92.51k £76.57k
Total expenditure £48.03k £65.12k £77.38k £80.68k £65.16k
Income from government contracts £32.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A