London Freemasons Charity

Charity number: 1081205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.79m £1.15m £1.14m £1.01m £851.67k
Total expenditure £1.53m £795.38k £545.27k £1.20m £1.44m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.75m £1.10m £1.09m £954.10k £809.82k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.20k £53.87k £48.52k £52.32k £41.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £792.94k £545.27k £1.20m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.02k £2.44k £2.39k £4.63k £5.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £1.20m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.56k £2.44k £0 £0 £0