Financial history THE ATLANTIC EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1081459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £126.70k £67.23k £92.70k £24.31k £76.71k
Total expenditure £73.43k £77.21k £68.50k £45.00k £48.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A