Trustees THE ATLANTIC EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1081459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Hon David Cameron Chair 01 June 2022
None on record
Rt Hon Nicklaus Thomas-Symonds MP Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Lady Theresa May MP Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
George Edward Bell Holding Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Baroness Fall Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
THE RT HON JACK STRAW MP Trustee 12 May 2015
None on record
SIR DAVID GEOFFREY MANNING GCMG CVO Trustee 30 September 2007
CHAPEL MAINTENANCE FUND OF THE MOST DISTINGUISHED ORDER OF ST MICHAEL AND ST GEORGE
Received: On time
SIR EVELYN DE ROTHSCHILD Trustee
THE ERANDA ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE RT HON LORD HOWARD OF LYMPNE QC Trustee
THE COUNCIL OF CHRISTIANS AND JEWS
Received: On time
LORD MARLAND OF ODSTOCK Trustee
THE GUGGENHEIM UK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MEG ALLEN Trustee
None on record
LORD PETER CHADLINGTON Trustee
None on record