THE KESWICK CONVENTION TRUST

Charity number: 1083584
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Henry Adam Trustee 07 May 2014
SPRINGWOOD CHURCH, OAKWOOD (FORMERLY WOODLANDS CHURCH ON OAKWOOD) Charity reporting is up to date
DAVID GASCOIGNE Trustee 25 May 2011 None on record
Simon Hale Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record
John Edward Philip Taylor Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Clare Heath-Whyte Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
MARTIN SALTER Trustee 16 November 2017
GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH BEDFORD Charity reporting is up to date
Rev ALASDAIR PAINE Trustee 23 May 2012
THE JESUS LANE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE ALL SAINTS PAROCHIAL CHARITIES Charity reporting is 26 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY SEPULCHRE CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
REVD DR MATTHEW SLEEMAN Trustee 23 May 2012 None on record
Anna Putt Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Dr TIM CHESTER Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
Jodi Whitehouse Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Jeremy McQuiod Chair 23 April 2020 None on record