THE JOAN ADAMS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Relief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 30 August 2000: Standard registration
- 14 April 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1159992 LLANFAIR WATERDINE COMMUNITY TRUST
- THE VEDW FIELD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216 | £98 | £83 | £137 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £21 | £18 | £89 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 12 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 23 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 24 January 2013 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 7 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LLANFAIRWATERDINE IN SHROPSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR RECREATIONAL PURPOSES AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND PURSUITS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LLANFAIRWATERDINE IN SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window