RUSSIAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.15k £18.02k £14.24k £11.93k £9.95k
Total expenditure £18.26k £19.54k £17.21k £10.00k £9.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £14.24k N/A N/A