THE SOCIETY OF LOCAL AUTHORITY CHIEF EXECUTIVES AND SENIOR MANAGERS (SOLACE GROUP) LTD

Charity number: 1084419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Howard Fitzgerald Trustee 18 October 2018
STATUS EMPLOYMENT LTD Received: 89 days late
Anne Marion Donaghy Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Nazeya Hussain-Duke Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Jane Burns Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Diana Terris Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Adam Mark Hill Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Ruth Elizabeth Hyde Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
David Victor Plank Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Doreen Elizabeth Forrester-Brown Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Mary Teresa Weastell Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Christopher David Naylor Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Andrew William Muter Trustee 12 October 2016 None on record
GAVIN LINDSAY JONES Trustee 12 October 2016 None on record
Graeme Victor McDonald Trustee 15 October 2014 None on record
Joanne Lucille Roney Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Sian Louise Sanders Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Paul Renato Frainer Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record