The Ivors Academy Trust

Charity number: 1080325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.20k £130 £1.00k
Total expenditure £4.66k £6.59k £57.29k £38.31k £8.08k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A