The Ivors Academy Trust

Charity number: 1080325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Leathem Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record
Clifford Fluet Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record
Natasha Jane Baldwin Trustee 29 May 2020 None on record
Helienne Lindvall Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Melanie Johnson Trustee 24 June 2020 None on record
Charlotte Harris Trustee 15 February 2021 None on record
Michael Adex Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Michael Dugher Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Oliver Vibrans Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Sally Anne Gross Trustee 29 May 2020 None on record
Lucy Francis Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record
Katie Jane Lotte Lam Trustee 02 February 2021
ANTIC FACE Received: On time