CREEKSIDE EDUCATION TRUST LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides safe public access to Deptford Creek for recreational,educational and training purposes for all ages and backgrounds.We enable local communities to be more involved and aware of their local environment and community space. It runs low tide walks,educational visits, rubbish clean ups, seminars for regeneration and development staff, holiday events and team building events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 27 September 2000: Standard registration
- THE DEPTFORD DIPPER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marita Saskia Brown | Chair | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Alexandra Page | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic James McGuire | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Tracy Kerr | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Glanville | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Eleanor Mandlik | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Slater | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Coss | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Boyd | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.18k | £174.56k | £178.09k | £161.73k | £136.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.49k | £140.28k | £165.63k | £174.00k | £169.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.01k | £117 | £12.56k | £20.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 12 JULY 2006. as amended on 29 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE DEPTFORD CREEK AND RIVER THAMES AREA; (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS; (C) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF DEPTFORD CREEK, THE RIVER THAMES AND THE LOCAL ENVIRONMENT FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WHICH DO NOT DAMAGE OR POLLUTE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING, WORKING OR RESORTING IN THE AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE, GENDER, ETHNIC ORIGIN, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH OR RELIGIOUS, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION.
Area of benefit
DEPTFORD CREEK, THE RIVER THAMES AND THE LOCAL ENVIRONMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creekside Education Trust Ltd
14 Creekside
Deptford
lONDON
SE8 4SA
- Phone:
- 0208 692 9922
- Email:
- info@creeksidecentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window