Accounts and annual returns MARY CECILY WOODS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1079711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required