Financial history MARY CECILY WOODS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1079711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £3.87k £4.21k £4.37k £4.31k £3.22k
Total expenditure £3.80k £1.12k £4.45k £3.50k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A