Financial history 3RD HAVERING ( ST. JAMES ) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1079722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £16.44k £16.43k £16.43k £16.43k £8.20k
Total expenditure £18.61k £17.76k £17.76k £17.76k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A