THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST ANDREW'S CHURCHES IN THANET

Charity number: 1082437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 December 2018 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 March 2018 121 days late Download