THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST ANDREW'S CHURCHES IN THANET

Charity number: 1082437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £139.25k £1.99k £145 £53 £500
Total expenditure £9.03k £50.57k £127.14k £0 £500
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A