Accounts and annual returns WORCESTER AND DISTRICT DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 1080285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required