THE INSTITUTE FOR PHILANTHROPY

Charity number: 1093927
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £192.67k £345.82k £513.99k £6.60k £88.36k
Total expenditure £275.48k £310.24k £417.14k £207.95k £403.93k