Accounts and annual returns YESHUAS AVRHOM LTD

Charity number: 1080631
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 14 March 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 14 March 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 22 June 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 22 June 2020 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 22 June 2020 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 22 June 2020 480 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 04 June 2018 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 04 June 2018 96 days late Download Open in new window